Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Ndex West LLC
Plaintiff: David A. Thomas
Case Number: 3:2013cv02065
Filed: May 6, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 14, 2013. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
August 6, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/6/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
September 23, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
March 25, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 42 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Leigh Otsuka Curran
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ndex West LLC
Represented By: Madeleine King Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Thomas
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]