Beauchamp v. De Latorre et al

Defendant: Espinoza, F. De Latorre, Jr., D. J. Doglietto and I. Soekardi
Plaintiff: Eric C. Beauchamp
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02098
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
August 7, 2014 63 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 12, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE and Order denying 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Eric C. Beauchamp. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 10/11/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beauchamp v. De Latorre et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espinoza
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. De Latorre, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. J. Doglietto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Soekardi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric C. Beauchamp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]