White v. Clarence et al

Defendant: Kathleen Dyer, Nanci L. Clarence and Clarence & Dyer, L.L.P.
Plaintiff: Thomas F. White
Case Number: 3:2013cv02106
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time filed by Kathleen Dyer, Clarence & Dyer, L.L.P., Nanci L. Clarence. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
October 15, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Continue CMC filed by Kathleen Dyer, Clarence & Dyer, L.L.P., Nanci L. Clarence. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/13/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/15/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
December 13, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 STIPULATION Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Kathleen Dyer, Clarence & Dyer, L.L.P., Nanci L. Clarence. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/112/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Clarence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Dyer
Represented By: Stanley Gracey Roman
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanci L. Clarence
Represented By: Stanley Gracey Roman
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence & Dyer, L.L.P.
Represented By: Tracy M. Clements
Represented By: Stanley Gracey Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas F. White
Represented By: Diane Chamberlin Deckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.