Gibbs v. Farley et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Gibbs
Defendant: T. Farley, J. Andersen, R. Grahams and Chisman
Case Number: 3:2013cv02114
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 14 *** ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Provide Current Address Necessary to Locate Defendant. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013) Modified on 8/21/2013 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 13 .ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Provide Current Address Necessary to Locate Defendant. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
April 24, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Without Prejudice Motion to Dismiss; Scheduling Amended Complaint, Motions terminated: 38 MOTION for Leave to File, 23 MOTION to Dismiss ; Under Rule 12(B); Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/23/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
August 5, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER OF SERVICE Dispositive Motion due by 11/3/2014. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/04/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
March 12, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER OF SERVICE. Dispositive Motion due by 6/10/2015. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
June 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SERVING COGNIZABLE CLAIMS Dispositive Motion due by 8/27/2013. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 06/25/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibbs v. Farley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Grahams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.