Rodgers v. Munk et al

Defendant: Copeland, Firkins, O'Valle, Brooks, Kunkel, Justice, Bonifacio, Greg Munk, Vasquez and Bleeker
Plaintiff: Russell Dwayne Rodgers
Case Number: 3:2013cv02116
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Referring Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PARTIAL SERVICE; DENYING SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ANDREQUEST FOR CONSOLIDATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/28/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James finding as moot 14 Motion for Reconsideration (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
October 28, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James denying 39 Motion to Compel; denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 40 Motion ; denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 21 Motion to Compel; denying 22 Motion to Compel; granting 29 Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
November 7, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING: Order to Show Cause IN WRITING, to be filed by 12/2/2013 05:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2013, in writing, no appearance is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/7/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK TO RE-FILE DOCKET NO. 57 IN C 13-5384. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
January 7, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 35 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
June 7, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/7/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2013: # 1 Proof of Servicde) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Munk et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copeland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Valle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kunkel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonifacio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Munk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bleeker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Dwayne Rodgers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]