Jekowsky v. BMW of North America, LLC

Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Barry Jekowsky
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02158
Filed: May 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/19/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 29, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 16 Stipulation re ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 29, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
November 14, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/14/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
December 13, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
February 25, 2014 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 38 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE UNTIL JUNE 13, 2014. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jekowsky v. BMW of North America, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Jekowsky
Represented By: Bryan Kemnitzer
Represented By: Mark Andrew Chavez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]