Manzanillo v. Moulton

Plaintiff: Raymond Manzanillo
Defendant: John Moulton
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02174
Filed: May 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Del Norte
Referring Judge: PSLC MSH
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; SECOND ORDER OF SERVICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting re 9 Motion for Leave to File. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
December 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ORDER ADDRESSING PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY MOTION re 26 MOTION to Request the Court to Direct U.S. Marshals to Serve Attached Subpoenas & Depositions by Written Questions to Non-Parties and Order Non-Parties to Respond Directly to the C ourt's Clerk filed by Raymond Manzanillo. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 8, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 ECF 26 pages 7 through 11, # 2 ECF 26 pages 16 through 23, # 3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 30, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADDRESSING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 27 Motion to Compel; denying 28 Motion to Conduct Depositions. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
January 16, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SIGN AND U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUBPOENAS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 14, 2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
July 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Dispositive Motion due by 10/10/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 11, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
September 25, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgmen t; denying as moot 81 Motion to Supplement Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 83 Motion to Strike. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Manzanillo v. Moulton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Manzanillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moulton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]