Charles Schwab Corporation et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Citibank, N.A., CitiGroup, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, HBOS PLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Norinchukin Bank, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, Portigon AG and Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG
Plaintiff: Schwab Yieldplus Fund Liquidation Trust, Schwab Yieldplus Fund, Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves, Schwab Cash Reserves, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., Charles Schwab Corporation and Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02244
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by the MDL Panel on 10/2/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
May 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 5/22/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Charles Schwab Corporation et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Patrick E. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Julie Saranow Epley
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Julie Saranow Epley
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Patrick E. King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Banking Group PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBOS PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Canada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norinchukin Bank
Represented By: Sara B. Brody
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: Michael A Mugmon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Joel Steven Sanders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portigon AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westdeutsche Immobilienbank AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Yieldplus Fund Liquidation Trust
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Yieldplus Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Advisor Cash Reserves
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Cash Reserves
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Investor Money Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Money Market Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Total Bond Market Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab Corporation
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Steven Eliott Fineman
Represented By: Brendan Patrick Glackin
Represented By: Lowell Harry Haky
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Marc Pilotin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]