Arnaudov et al v. California Delta Mechanical, Inc et al

Defendant: California Delta Mechanical, Inc and Todor Kitchukov
Plaintiff: Eric Olson, Dragan Lerinc, Nicola Vlaovic, Serghey Dragni, Victor Dragni, Mihail Slavkov, Ivan Velichkov and Martin Arnaudov
Case Number: 3:2013cv02306
Filed: May 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2015 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT Re: Dkt. No. 80 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
January 12, 2015 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION - The Court reschedules this trial to 2/3/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 15, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REMEDY DEFICIENCIES IN PRETRIAL STATEMENT Re: Dkt. No. 122 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/15/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 16, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART JOINT REQUEST TO VACATE DEADLINES Re: Dkt. No. 128 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/16/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
August 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
January 14, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT 36 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014).
June 25, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion To Exceed Page Limit For Three Party Joint Statement Regarding Discovery Disputes 62 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
July 3, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Regarding Discovery Disputes 63 64 67 69 74 . (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnaudov et al v. California Delta Mechanical, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Delta Mechanical, Inc
Represented By: Claudio E Iannitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todor Kitchukov
Represented By: Claudio E Iannitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Olson
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dragan Lerinc
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicola Vlaovic
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serghey Dragni
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Dragni
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mihail Slavkov
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Velichkov
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Arnaudov
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]