Doe v. PriceWaterHouseCoopers Health and Welfare Benefit Plan et al

Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and PriceWaterHouseCoopers Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
Plaintiff: John Doe
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02710
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION to Continue the September 27, 2013 Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
December 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
March 14, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/14/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 18, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/18/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
April 21, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule on Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/21/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
June 11, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
August 5, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Settlement Conference set for 9/10/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
September 24, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Bench Trial set for 12/12/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Doe v. PriceWaterHouseCoopers Health and Welfare Benefit Plan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PriceWaterHouseCoopers Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Represented By: David Joseph Linden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]