Nalco Company v. Turner Design, Inc

Defendant: Turner Design, Inc
Plaintiff: Nalco Company
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02727
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 18, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom Necessary for September 24 Hearing on Summary Judgment re 115 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/18/2014.
October 17, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING TURNER'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION Re: Dkt. Nos. 95 100 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014) Modified on 10/17/2014 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/27/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
February 11, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Case Management Conference to 4/16/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/11/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 18, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR HEARING 44 . Hearing re Discovery Letter Brief 37 set for 3/5/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/18/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 19, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS 24 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
March 31, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Denying 37 Nalco's Motion to Compel (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
June 25, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING TERMS OF U.S. PATENT NO. 6,255,118. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on June 25, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
August 11, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nalco Company v. Turner Design, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Design, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nalco Company
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Represented By: Daniel Wan
Represented By: Alessa Yin-Chen Phang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]