Rhodes v. Prudential Insurance Company Of America

Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company Of America
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rhodes
Case Number: 3:2013cv02749
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
December 6, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FILING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 22 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/6/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
January 8, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/8/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
June 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/24/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Prudential Insurance Company Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.