Touchscreen Gestures LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Touchscreen Gestures LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02759
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 55 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
October 16, 2013 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Apple, Inc., Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
August 10, 2013 53 ANSWER to Counterclaim byTouchscreen Gestures LLC. (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 8/10/2013)
July 26, 2013 52 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Touchscreen Gestures LLC byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 2))(Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 51 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 24, 2013 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple, Inc. for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Mehta, Sonal) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 49 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 11, 2013, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2013. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 24, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting (55) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-WHA, 3:13-cv-02758-WHA, 3:13-cv-02759-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting (54) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-WHA, 3:13-cv-02758-WHA, 3:13-cv-02759-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 19, 2013 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc.. Filed byTouchscreen Gestures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Huff, Winston) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
July 17, 2013 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Apple, Inc., Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY filed by Apple, Inc., Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 12, 2013 42 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Case referred to Private ADR. Discovery due by 8/29/2014. Jury Trial set for 1/12/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 10/2/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/11/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 11, 2013 43 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/11/2013 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/11/2013). Jury Selection set for 1/12/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/11/2013)
July 9, 2013 41 ADR Clerk Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/10/13 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 40 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 5, 2013 39 EXHIBITS re 38 Joint Case Management Statement filed byTouchscreen Gestures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 38 ) (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 5, 2013 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT And Proposed Order filed by Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 3, 2013 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Defendant Apple, Inc. (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 2, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/2/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 2, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Cases are related and shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/1/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 1, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re (29 in 3:13-cv-02758-WHA) Order on Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re (29 in 3:13-cv-02758-MMC) Order on Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Arjun Harsh Mehra (Mehra, Arjun) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup denying (44) Motion to Continue in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-EMC, 3:13-cv-02758-MMC, 5:13-cv-02759-EJD(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 32 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 1, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/1/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 30, 2013 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Touchscreen Gestures LLC (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 6/30/2013)
June 28, 2013 29 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 27, 2013 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Touchscreen Gestures LLC.. (Huff, Winston) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 17, 2013 27 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Case Management Conference to 7/24/2013 10:00 am before Judge Cousins is Courtroom, A, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due 7/17/203. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 26 CLERKS NOTICE : Informing all Parties that this case is now with the United States District Court for the Northern District of California re 25 transfer Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 24 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00262. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 14, 2013 25 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 6/14/13. (Attachments: # 1 NC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
May 24, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER vacating 17 Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/24/13. (mll, )
May 24, 2013 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 6-13-2013, per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
May 24, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion to Change Venue. This case is hereby transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/24/13. (mll, )
May 23, 2013 21 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue To The Northern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Garland Stephens)(Stephens, Garland) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2013: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
April 3, 2013 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Jagai on behalf of Touchscreen Gestures LLC (Jagai, Deborah)
February 12, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/12/13. cc:attys 2-12-13(mll, )
January 28, 2013 18 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Stephens, Garland)
October 23, 2012 This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv260, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
October 23, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER that this civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv260 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the Lead Case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming 11-14-2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/23/12. cc:attys 10-24-12(mll, )
October 4, 2012 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan Greenblatt, # 2 Exhibit A)(Stephens, Garland)
September 24, 2012 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huff, Winston)
September 7, 2012 14 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Buckley, # 2 Affidavit Nathan Greenblatt, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Stephens, Garland)
August 24, 2012 13 ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Apple) by Touchscreen Gestures LLC.(Huff, Winston)
June 26, 2012 12 ANSWER to 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Touchscreen Gestures LLC.(Huff, Winston)
June 18, 2012 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Greenblatt on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Greenblatt, Nathan)
June 14, 2012 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Stephens, Garland)
June 14, 2012 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
June 14, 2012 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
June 14, 2012 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Mehta, Sonal)
June 14, 2012 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Touchscreen Gestures LLC by Apple, Inc..(Mehta, Sonal)
April 12, 2012 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
April 12, 2012 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Navarro, Arthur)
April 12, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Touchscreen Gestures LLC (Navarro, Arthur)
April 12, 2012 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Oliver Huff on behalf of Touchscreen Gestures LLC (Huff, Winston)
April 11, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
April 11, 2012 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3537236.), filed by Touchscreen Gestures LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Navarro, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Touchscreen Gestures LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Touchscreen Gestures LLC
Represented By: Arthur Isaac Navarro
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Sonal N. Mehta
Represented By: Arjun Harsh Mehra
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Nathan Greenblatt
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Garland T. Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]