East Bay Law v. Ford Motor Company

Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: East Bay Law
Case Number: 3:2013cv02822
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Defendant's motion to dismiss. 10 Motion to dismiss is terminated. Opposition to 16 Motion to dismiss due by 09/23/13. Reply due by 09/30/13. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/10/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
September 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Defendant's previously-filed Motion to Dismiss, Motions terminated: 16 MOTION to Dismiss (RE-NOTICED) filed by Ford Motor Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Responses due by 9/30/2013. Replies due by 10/7/2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/18/13. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
November 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 10 Motion to Dismiss (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
July 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 5 Stipulation To Extend Time for Filing Response to Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/24/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Bay Law v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Law
Represented By: Andrew Wagdy Shalaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.