Octavian Marks LLC v. Marka Shipping LTD

Defendant: Marka Shipping LTD
Plaintiff: Octavian Marks LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02863
Filed: June 20, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S re 7 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN; filed by Octavian Marks LLC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 13 Featured Case IN ADMIRALTY WARRANT of Arrest issued (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 28, 2013 20 Featured Case Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 19 Stipulation.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
August 5, 2013 30 Featured Case Order by Hon. Samuel Conti denying 26 Ex Parte Application.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 7, 2013 35 Featured Case Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 31 Ex Parte Application.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
June 20, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by the Executive Committee. Signed by Richard W. Wieking, Clerk of the Court (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER FOR ISSUING WARRANT OF ARREST. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Octavian Marks LLC v. Marka Shipping LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marka Shipping LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavian Marks LLC
Represented By: Max L. Kelley
Represented By: Rupert P. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]