Manion et al v. Vintage Pharmaceuticals L.L.C. et al

Defendant: Patheon Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holding Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Longs Drug Stores California L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Brian Dodd and Ashley Manion
Case Number: 3:2013cv02996
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
August 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule for CVS Pharmacy Inc. and Longs Drugs Stores of California L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Ashley Manion, Brian Dodd. Responses due by 8/26/2013. Replies due by 9/2/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
September 30, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING FOR ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE FROM DEFENDANT CVS TO BE FILED BY 10/4/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
October 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Longs Drug Stores of California LLC's Motion to Dismiss With Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
November 12, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Longs Drug Stores California L.L.C. Only, filed by Ashley Manion, Brian Dodd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on November 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 12, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 56 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Brian Dodd, Ashley Manion filed by Ashley Manion, Brian Dodd. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on November 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
February 20, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATE AND DEADLINES re 66 Stipulation filed by Ashley Manion Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/20/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
May 5, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting CMC from 5/13/14 to 7/10/14. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
June 19, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal filed by Ashley Manion, Brian Dodd, ***Deadlines terminated. 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal filed by Ashley Manion, Brian Dodd.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manion et al v. Vintage Pharmaceuticals L.L.C. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patheon Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holding Inc.
Represented By: Robert Stephen Magee
Represented By: Pamela Joan Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Joan Yates
Represented By: Robert Stephen Magee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Pharmaceuticals L.L.C.
Represented By: Pamela Joan Yates
Represented By: Robert Stephen Magee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores California L.L.C.
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dodd
Represented By: Emily Christine Wecht
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Manion
Represented By: Emily Christine Wecht
Represented By: Khaldoun Baghdadi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]