Chen v. Deutsche Bank Natioal Trust Company et al

Defendant: Western Progressive LLC, Securitized Asset Backed Receivables, LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Nan Hui Chen
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03352
Filed: July 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 1/27/2014. Repl ies due by (seven days after opposition is served and filed) 2/3/2014. Motion Hearing is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 3/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
March 25, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re Joseph L. DeClue now attorney of record for Plaintiff re 45 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Nan Hui Chen. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/25/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
May 1, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/1/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
June 9, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 33 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying in part 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff has to Monday, 7/14/2014 to file. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
October 21, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE to 12/1/2014 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/21/2014. Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2014.(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Chen v. Deutsche Bank Natioal Trust Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securitized Asset Backed Receivables, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Systems Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nan Hui Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]