Bank of New York Mellon v. City of Richmond, California et al Featured Case

Defendant: Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council, City of Richmond, California and Gordian Sword LLC
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon, U.S. Bank National Association, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Wilmington Trust Company and Wilmington Trust, National Association
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03664
Filed: August 7, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 72 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 55 Motion for Sanctions. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 7, 2014 71 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/01/2013 before Judge Charles R. Breyer, re 64 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 1/8/2014. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
December 27, 2013 70 OBJECTIONS to re 68 Reply to Opposition/Response, Objection to Defendants' Reply Evidence by Plaintiff Trustees Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association, U.S. Bank National Association and by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 20, 2013 69 USCA Case Number 13-17505 9th Circuit for 64 Notice of Appeal filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 68 REPLY (re 55 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byCity of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stacey Leyton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 10, 2013 67 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 34611092034 re 64 Notice of Appeal filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 66 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 10, 2013 65 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 64 Notice of Appeal (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2013)
December 9, 2013 64 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. Appeal of Judgment 54 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) Joint Notice of Appeal (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 2, 2013 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 22, 2013 62 Proposed Order re 59 Opposition/Response to Motion, Denying Rule 11 Sanctions by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 61 Declaration of Brian Hershman in Support of 60 Declaration in Support, of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, Exhibit H, Part 1 of 2 filed byU.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, Part 2 of 2, # 2 Exhibit I, Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit I, Part 2 of 2, # 4 Exhibit J, # 5 Exhibit K, # 6 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 60 Declaration of Brian D. Hershman in Support of 59 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Rule 11 Sanctions filed byU.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 59 ) (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 59 RESPONSE (re 55 MOTION for Sanctions ) by Trustees filed byBank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 20, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE HEARING AND REPLY BRIEF ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION to Continue filed by Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C.,et al.. Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to 55 MOTION for Sanctions , 57 Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE HEARING AND REPLY BRIEF ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply MOTION to Continue ., Motions terminated: Replies due by 12/20/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
November 18, 2013 57 Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE HEARING AND REPLY BRIEF ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , MOTION to Continue filed by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Brown, # 2 Proposed Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 14, 2013 56 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (text entry, no document associated with this entry). Reset Hearing as to 55 MOTION for Sanctions . Motion Hearing reset for 12/20/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 8, 2013 55 MOTION for Sanctions filed by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 11/22/2013. Replies due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stacey Leyton, # 2 Exhibit A to Leyton Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Leyton Decl, # 4 Exhibit C to Leyton Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Leyton Decl, # 6 Proposed Order Prop Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
November 8, 2013 54 JUDGMENT for defendants and against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/8/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 52 CLERKS NOTICE vacating CMC set for 8:30 on 11/08/2013. Text entry only, no document associated with this entry. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 5, 2013 51 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-01-2013, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Official Court Reporter, Connie Kuhl, CSR, RPR, RMR, CRR, sheeemack@gmail.com, Telephone number 415-572-1519. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2014. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 50 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association for Court Reporter Connie Kuhl. (Chelgren, Whitney) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 1, 2013 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
November 1, 2013 48 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/1/2013) re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Richmond City Council. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2013)
October 31, 2013 47 RESPONSE to re 44 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Defendants Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C. and Gordian Sword LLC by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 31, 2013 46 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Augusto Privat (Privat, Carlos) (Filed on 10/31/2013) Modified on 11/1/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2013 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Augusto Privat (Privat, Carlos) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 21, 2013 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 16, 2013 43 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (M E Johnson) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 42 REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed byCity of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael E. Johnson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8072748.) filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Chelgren, Whitney) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 40 Proposed Order re 28 Motion to Dismiss by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2013 39 NOTICE by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. identifying corporate parent Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York mellon Trust Company, N.A. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/10/2013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2013 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank, Other Affiliate M&T Bank Corporation, Other Affiliate Wilmington Trust Corporation for Wilmington Trust Company; Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Chelgren, Whitney) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 9, 2013 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. Filed byBank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 8, 2013 35 RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 34 filed byBank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 4, 2013 34 RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byBank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Loretta Lundberg in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Brian Hershman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Brian Hershman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Declaration of Joseph L. Nardi in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Joseph L. Nardi in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Declaration of Bronwyn Pollock in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, # 7 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Bronwyn Pollock in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
September 30, 2013 33 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer denying 29 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Briefing and Waive Hearing on 28 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 25, 2013 32 Declaration of Eric P. Brown in Support of 31 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byCity of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 31 REPLY (re 29 Ex Parte Application re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND FOREGO HEARING ) filed byCity of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 24, 2013 30 RESPONSE (re 29 Ex Parte Application re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND FOREGO HEARING ) filed byWilmington Trust Company, Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kurt Osenbaugh)(Osenbaugh, Kurt) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 20, 2013 29 Ex Parte Application re 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND FOREGO HEARING filed by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Eric P. Brown in Support of Ex Parte, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H to the Declaration of Eric P. Brown, # 10 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 10/4/2013. Replies due by 10/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 16, 2013 27 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Falik (Falik, William) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Prince Brown (Brown, Eric) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Alan Kronland (Kronland, Scott) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Berzon (Berzon, Stephen) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 16, 2013 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT filed by City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (Leyton, Stacey) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
August 29, 2013 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. re 21 Case Management Scheduling Order (Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 20 NOTICE by Bank of New York Mellon re 18 Order on Stipulation for Filing Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 3, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 3, # 4 Exhibit B Part 3 of 3)(Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE -13-3664JCS to C-13-3663CRB. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (CRB) immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will be rescheduled by the Court. The parties shall adjust the dates for the conference, disclosures and report required by FRCivP 16 and 26 accordingly. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 26, 2013 18 Order, signed 8/26/13, by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 17 Stipulation For Filing of Second Amended Complaint.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 22, 2013 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Filing Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to SAC, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to SAC, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to SAC, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D to SAC, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E to SAC, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F to SAC, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G to SAC, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H to SAC, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I to SAC, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J to SAC, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K to SAC, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L to SAC, # 13 Proposed Order Proposed order pursuant to stipulation, # 14 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of service)(Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 15, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER, signed 8/15/13, by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joseph B. Sconyers. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER, signed 8/15/13, by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew A. Martel. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of New York Mellon. Gordian Sword LLC served on 8/9/2013, answer due 8/30/2013. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of New York Mellon. Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C. served on 8/9/2013, answer due 8/30/2013. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of New York Mellon. Richmond City Council served on 8/8/2013, answer due 8/29/2013. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of New York Mellon. City of Richmond, California served on 8/8/2013, answer due 8/29/2013. (Falk, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 14, 2013 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew A. Martel ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7925258.) filed by US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Martel, Matthew) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph B. Sconyers ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7925167.) filed by US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sconyers, Joseph) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 8 NOTICE by US Bank National Association re 6 Amended Complaint,, Corporate Disclosure Statement of U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, on Behalf of the Trusts Listed in Exhibit B to the Amended Complaint (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by US Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent US Bank National Association for US Bank National Association. re 6 Amended Complaint,, on Behalf of Trusts Listed in Exhibit B to the Amended Complaint (Hershman, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 9, 2013 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filed byBank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Pollock, Bronwyn) (Filed on 8/9/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 4 Summons Issued as to City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
August 7, 2013 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bank of New York Mellon (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of New York Mellon. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2013 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against City of Richmond, California, Gordian Sword LLC, Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C., Richmond City Council (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 34611088678). Filed by Bank of New York Mellon. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2013: # 1 Exhibits D-H, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. City of Richmond, California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Resolution Partners L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richmond City Council
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond, California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordian Sword LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Bronwyn Fitzgerald Pollock
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Matthew Alex Martel
Represented By: Joseph B Sconyers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Bronwyn Fitzgerald Pollock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]