Lopez v. Clous et al

Defendant: Justin Mead, Aric Enos, Ken Henderson, Nick Nguyen, Clous, Luis Martin and John Pate
Plaintiff: Fernando G. Lopez
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv03870
Filed: August 21, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement. Motion is GRANTED as to Sergeant Clous, Detective Henderson and officers Enos and Pate, and DENIED as to o fficers Martin, Mead and Nguyen re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice) filed by Ken Henderson, et al. A settlement conference shall take place within 120 days of the date of this order, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
December 17, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 2/18/2014.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
January 17, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER OF SERVICE Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 3/18/2014.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/15/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lopez v. Clous et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Mead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric Enos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Nguyen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clous
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando G. Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]