Nelson v. Home Depot USA, Inc.

Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Debra Nelson
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04026
Filed: August 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 23, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/23/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
December 16, 2013 22 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 21 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nelson v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron L. Agenbroad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Nelson
Represented By: James Chisholm Ashworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]