Ezirim v. Bank of America Corporation, et al

Defendant: Bank of America Corporation and Seterus, Inc
Plaintiff: Rachel Ezirim
Case Number: 3:2013cv04031
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/23/2014 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2014.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/30/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 5, 2013 CMC; SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS FOR DECEMBER 26, 2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/29/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
December 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION BY 12/26/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/12/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezirim v. Bank of America Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Ezirim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.