Ai-Daiwa, Ltd. v. Apparent, Inc. et al

Defendant: Apparent Solar Investments, LLC, Apparent Solar, Inc., Apparent Energy, Inc., Apparent, Inc., Xslent, LLC and Xslent Energy Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Ai-Daiwa, Ltd.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04156
Filed: September 9, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING MEET AND CONFER AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 11/22/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Parties to file by 11/18/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/14/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 19, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING,Vacating the 11/22/2013 Compliance hearing. Case referred to mediation to be completed by 1/31/14. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2014. Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by 1/13/2014. Replies due by 2/4/2014. Responses due by 1/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/19/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
March 10, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 29 Motion to Dismiss; denying 30 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
April 1, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, Mediation, to be completed by 7/31/14. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 0 8:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 1/16/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
April 7, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY SETS THE FOLLOWING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR- Private Mediation to be completed by 7/31/14. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2014. Non-Expert Discovery d ue by 10/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Selection set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 5 Day Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Dispositive Motions Heard by 12/2/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2 /6/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 1/16/2015 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/7/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
May 6, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT OF ANSWER AND VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Answer due by 5/19/2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 16, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 53 Statement re Failure to Agree on Court-Appointed Expert, filed by Ai-Daiwa, Ltd. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
June 24, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 62 Stipulation to Extend the Date for Production to the Court Appointed Expert.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
July 17, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 70 Stipulation Selecting Dr. John McNulty as Court Appointed Expert.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 Stipulation Rescheduling 59 MOTION to Dismiss CORRECTION OF DOCKET Nos. 56 and 57 . Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/17/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 28, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 72 Discovery Letter Brief.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
August 15, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
September 25, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 84 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Defendant Apparent Solar Investments (II) LLC, is required to E-FILE the amended document.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ai-Daiwa, Ltd. v. Apparent, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apparent Solar Investments, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apparent Solar, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apparent Energy, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apparent, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xslent, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xslent Energy Technologies, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ai-Daiwa, Ltd.
Represented By: Brock Robert Lyle
Represented By: Chi-Hung A. Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]