Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04201
Filed: September 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2013 94 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 12/5/2013 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 at 11:00 AM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 11, 2013 93 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas (Tyler); Case Number 6:12-cv-00783-MHS-CMC. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California, per Judge, due to notice of no opposition filed so no longer holding for 20 days. (sm, )
August 30, 2013 92 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC re 91 Order on Motion to Change Venue Evolutionary Intelligence's Notice of Non-Opposition to Magistrate's Report & Recommendation (McCrary, Marie)
August 27, 2013 91 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/27/13. (bas, )
August 21, 2013 90 Featured Case ORDER denying 79 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 08/21/13. (mll, )
August 19, 2013 89 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Notice of Initial Disclosures (King, Patrick)
August 19, 2013 88 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC NOTICE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 2, 2013 87 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
June 28, 2013 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 28, 2013 85 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 27, 2013 84 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ESI ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ESI Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Reuben Chen, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Chen, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of Chen, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of Chen, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of Chen)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2013 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order and ESI Order by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 21, 2013 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Defendants' Opposition to Evolutionary Intelligence's Motion for Reconsideration and Objections to Magistrate's Order Denying Leave to File Amended Complaints filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, Patrick)
June 17, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to File protective orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 12, 2013 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Apple Inc., Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 2 Revised Proposed Order) (sm, ).
June 11, 2013 79 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re 72 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
June 5, 2013 78 Featured Case SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:Markman Hearing set for 4/22/2014 10:00 AM in (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 77 Featured Case MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 5, 2013 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2013. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (lfs, )
June 3, 2013 75 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 29, 2013 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Patek, Anthony)
May 29, 2013 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/29/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 72 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/28/13. (bas, )
May 28, 2013 71 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 28, 2013 70 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Kennedy, Todd)
May 23, 2013 69 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions PR 3-1 and 3-2 (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 22, 2013 68 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Safier, Seth)
May 21, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The new deadline is MAY 29, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/21/13. (bas, )
May 20, 2013 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, Motion to Consolidate by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate)(Patek, Anthony)
May 17, 2013 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marie Ann McCrary on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (McCrary, Marie)
May 16, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 15, 2013 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 15, 2013 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 McCarthy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Melissa)
May 14, 2013 61 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Patek, Anthony)
May 9, 2013 60 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Additional Attachments to Main Document: 59 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 5/10/2013 (gsg).
May 9, 2013 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 McCarthy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2013: # 7 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 9, 2013 58 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Certificate of Financially Interested Entities (Smith, Melissa)
May 3, 2013 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/3/13. (bas, )
May 2, 2013 56 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2013 55 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 29, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER regarding scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/13. (bas, )
April 29, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER TO MEET, REPORT AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2013 10:00 AM in Judge Stegers Courtroom (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/2013. (sm, )
April 29, 2013 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Responses due by 5/9/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/2013. (sm, )
April 29, 2013 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) Replies due by 5/15/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/29/2013. (sm, )
April 27, 2013 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 26, 2013 49 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Kennedy, Todd)
April 26, 2013 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 23, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/23/13. (bas, )
April 22, 2013 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 22, 2013 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Amended Complaint filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael De Angelo, # 2 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 12, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/12/13. (bas, )
April 11, 2013 43 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Exhibit 2 to Apple Inc.'s Opposition to Evolutionary Intelligence's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaints by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 11, 2013 42 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 41 Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
April 11, 2013 41 RESPONSE to Motion re 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Amended Complaint DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S OPPOSITION TO EVOLUTIONARY INTELLIGENCES'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit McCarthy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 10, 2013 40 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Consolidate)(Patek, Anthony)
April 8, 2013 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael De Angelo, # 2 Affidavit of Todd Kennedy, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
April 1, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/1/13. (bas, )
March 29, 2013 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
March 25, 2013 36 ***WITHDRAWN PER #72 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO AMEND***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Jumptap, Inc., Kronos Incorporated, RetailMeNot, Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Kennedy, Todd) Modified on 9/10/2013 (sm, ).
March 25, 2013 35 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Amended Complaint by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
March 8, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is APRIL 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/8/13. (bas, )
March 7, 2013 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
March 4, 2013 32 Evolutionary Intelligence's ANSWER to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple Inc. by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Patek, Anthony)
March 1, 2013 31 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. Service of Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production Regarding Venue (Smith, Melissa)
February 11, 2013 30 APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 7, 2013 28 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT (Patek, Anthony)
February 7, 2013 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc., filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Patek, Anthony)
February 6, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/06/13. cc:attys 2-07-13(mll, )
January 24, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a). Responses due by 3/8/2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/24/2013. (gsg)
January 22, 2013 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Safier, Seth)
January 15, 2013 24 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 10, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a); Responses due by 1/21/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/13. cc:attys 1-10-13 (mll, )
January 8, 2013 22 Evolutionary Intelligence's ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 7, 2013 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Todd)
January 4, 2013 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd M Kennedy on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Kennedy, Todd)
January 3, 2013 19 ***DEFICIENT FILING. SEE ENTRY 22 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT. *** Evolutionary Intelligence's ANSWER to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Patek, Anthony) Modified on 1/9/2013 (gsg).
December 21, 2012 18 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Buckley Declaration, # 2 Affidavit McCarthy Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 20, 2012 17 NOTICE by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC NOTICE CASE READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 17, 2012 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Apple Inc. served on 11/29/2012, answer due 12/13/2012. (mjc, )
December 17, 2012 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Jude Patek on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Patek, Anthony)
December 13, 2012 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 13, 2012 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
December 13, 2012 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patrick E King on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3915158. (King, Patrick)
December 13, 2012 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E Danley on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3915104. (Danley, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2012 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Colman D McCarthy on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3915052. (McCarthy, Colman)
December 10, 2012 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth A Safier on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Safier, Seth)
November 27, 2012 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (mjc, )
November 19, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 12/13/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 13, 2012 7 Return of Service Executed as to Apple Inc. on 10/23/2012, by personal service; answer due: 11/13/2012. (mll, )
November 13, 2012 6 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa)
October 24, 2012 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
October 18, 2012 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
October 17, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
October 17, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
October 17, 2012 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3833380.), filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A '536 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B '682 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E Danley
Represented By: Patrick E. King
Represented By: Colman D McCarthy
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]