Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: Foursquare Labs, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04203
Filed: September 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2014 102 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CLARIFY OR MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
March 29, 2014 108 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING 105 THE PARTIES' JOINT DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER DATED FEBRUARY 20, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/28/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2014)
October 7, 2013 65 Featured Case ORDER re 63 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC, Attorney Charles Ainsworth and Robert Christopher Bunt terminated.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 8, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE re 66 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/8/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 24, 2013 76 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CRAIG R. SMITH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM J. SEYMOUR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 24, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 30, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ERIC CARNEVALE PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
October 30, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF PLEADINGS AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2013. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
December 20, 2013 93 Featured Case PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/20/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 10, 2014 99 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW AND VACATING HEARING; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2014. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foursquare Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Steven William Flanders
Represented By: Karen I. Boyd
Represented By: Alan D. Albright
Represented By: William Joseph Seymour
Represented By: Craig R. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]