Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. LivingSocial, Inc.

Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Defendant: LivingSocial, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04205
Filed: September 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER re 66 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC, Attorney Charles Ainsworth and Robert Christopher Bunt terminated.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/7/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
October 8, 2013 69 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE re 68 Notice (Other) filed by Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/8/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 23, 2013 75 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/23/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
January 17, 2014 96 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW by Judge William H. Orrick granting 82 Motion to Stay pending a final decision by the PTO on the petitions for inter partes review. The parties shall file a joint status update on the inter partes review proceedings every six months from the date of this Order. Any party may file a motion to lift the stay at any time if the PTO decides not to grant any of the pending petitions. Evolutionary Intelligence's 90 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal is GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC v. LivingSocial, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evolutionary Intelligence, LLC
Represented By: Seth A Safier
Represented By: Anthony Jude Patek
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Todd Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Todd M Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LivingSocial, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M Swickhamer
Represented By: Jordan A Sigale
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]