ServiceNow, Inc. v. Stonebranch, Inc.

Plaintiff: ServiceNow, Inc.
Defendant: Stonebranch, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04243
Filed: September 12, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/23/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
November 4, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO HAVE PENDING MOTIONS HEARD ON THE SAME DAY. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
December 20, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
January 9, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2014 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 12/1/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 12/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/9/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
May 2, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 18 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 20 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 25 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ServiceNow, Inc. v. Stonebranch, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServiceNow, Inc.
Represented By: Liwen Arius Mah
Represented By: Ilana Simone Rubel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonebranch, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren S. Kowal
Represented By: Simon Robert Malko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]