Hoskins v. Gaylord et al

Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco and Hannah L. Blumenstiel
Defendant: Clifford Fried, Andrew J. Wiegel, Wiegel & Fried, LLP, Wiegel Law Group, Anthony Barreiro and Ray Parker Gaylord
Plaintiff: Janina M. Hoskins
Case Number: 3:2013cv04320
Filed: September 18, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ESTABLISHING "GOOD FAITH" SETTLEMENT AND BARRING INDEMNITY CLAIMS AGAINST SETTLING DEFENDANTS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 12 Motion for Settlement. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 22 . (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal With Prejudice As To Certain Defendants filed by Wiegel Law Group, Andrew J. Wiegel. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
February 23, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF RELATED CASES re 28 Notice filed by Ray Parker Gaylord. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins v. Gaylord et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: USBC Manager-San Francisco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hannah L. Blumenstiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Fried
Represented By: Alana Grice Conner
Represented By: Clifford Edward Fried
Represented By: Andrew J. Wiegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Wiegel
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Joseph J. De Hope, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Jonathan Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiegel & Fried, LLP
Represented By: Andrew J. Wiegel
Represented By: Clifford Edward Fried
Represented By: Alana Grice Conner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiegel Law Group
Represented By: Elizabeth Williams, Esq.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Represented By: Joseph J. De Hope, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Jonathan Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Barreiro
Represented By: Bretton C. Gerard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Parker Gaylord
Represented By: Bretton C. Gerard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janina M. Hoskins
Represented By: John Harrington MacConaghy, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]