Nada Pacific Corporation v. Power Engineering and Manufacturing, Ltd., et al

Defendant: Besser Company and Power Engineering and Manufacturing, LTD.
Plaintiff: Nada Pacific Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04325
Filed: September 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 BESSER'S MOTION TO DISMISS AKKERMAN'S COUNTER-CLAIMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/10/2014.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
July 11, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY DEADLINES: Re 64 Stipulation filed by Besser Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/11/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
August 20, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 66 Proposed Order filed by Nada Pacific Corporation. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/20/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
October 6, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court ORDERS the parties to meet-and-confer about them and to file a joint case management conference statement no later than 12:00 p.m. on Wednesday, October 8, 2014. The court also SETS a Case Mana gement Conference for 11:00 a.m. on Thursday, October 10, 2014 in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94131. The parties are welcome to appear at it through CourtCall, and they may make their own arrangements to do so. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/6/2014. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 9, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Re: 93 Proposed Order filed by Nada Pacific Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/9/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nada Pacific Corporation v. Power Engineering and Manufacturing, Ltd., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Besser Company
Represented By: Cory M. Curtis
Represented By: Michael Roland Matthias
Represented By: Justin T. Winquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Engineering and Manufacturing, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher K. Wee Teng
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nada Pacific Corporation
Represented By: David Michael Schoenfeld
Represented By: Lisa Denise Nicolls
Represented By: Jay Scott Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]