Pinterest, Inc. v. Pintrips, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pinterest, Inc.
Defendant: Pintrips, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04608
Filed: October 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Case Management Statement due 3/6/14. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 28, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME AND GRANTING OTHER RELIEF. Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/28/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
March 20, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2015 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 3/23/2015 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/20/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
July 18, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 57 MOTION for Discovery Motion to Issue Letter of Request filed by Pinterest, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/18/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
August 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 63 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 26, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
August 29, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 9/4/2014 re 73 MOTION for Protective Order, 57 MOTION for Letter of Request, and 72 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 08/29/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
September 4, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 73 Motion for Protective Order.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 12, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 82 Joint Discovery Letter Brief; Motions terminated: 86 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Pinterest, Inc... Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 09/12/14. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 15, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 72 Discovery Letter Brief.(kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
October 6, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 91 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Pinterest, Inc. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/06/2014. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 17, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 94 Discovery Letter BriefJoint letter filed by Pinterest, Inc., 95 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Pinterest, Inc... Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/17/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pinterest, Inc. v. Pintrips, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinterest, Inc.
Represented By: Donald A Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Siskind
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pintrips, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]