Alfaour v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Talal Alfaour
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv04719
Filed: October 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in any reassigned case are to bear the initials of the newly assigned judge (JSW) immediately after the case number. Any case management conference in any reassigned case will b e rescheduled by the Court. The parties shall adjust the dates for the conference, disclosures and report required by FRCivP 16 and 26 accordingly. Unless otherwise ordered, any dates for hearing noticed motions are vacated and must be re-noticed by the moving party before the newly assigned judge.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 1/13/2014.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/30/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
January 24, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/241/4. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alfaour v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Brian H. Chun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talal Alfaour
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]