Kalin v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Taylor Kalin
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv04727
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2014 58 RESPONSE re 57 Order for Briefing filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 12/15/2014) Modified on 12/15/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2014 57 Featured Case ORDER LIFTING STAY AND REQUEST FOR BRIEFING. Brief due by 12/15/2014 at noon. Joint Response due by 12/22/2014 at noon. Show Cause by 12/23/2014 at noon. Reply due by 12/29/2014 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 9, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014) Modified on 12/9/2014 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2014 56 Featured Case SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/16/2015. Jury Trial set for 9/14/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Class certification motion due 5/11/2015. Dispositive motion due by 7/13/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 19, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 18, 2014 55 RESPONSE to re 54 Order Plaintiff Taylor Kalins Consent to Joint Stipulation Re Pretrial Deadlines (Per DKT. No. 185) by Taylor Kalin. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 14, 2014 54 REQUEST RE PROPOSED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 16, 2014 53 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup re 52 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 16, 2014 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 6, 2014 51 Featured Case ORDER RE STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY FOR CALIFORNIA STATE-LAW CLAIMS re 50 Stipulation, 42 Case Management Order, Discovery due by 12/1/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 6, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 50 STIPULATION to Extend 10/31/14 Discovery and Disclosure Deadlines to Match Deadlines in Related Frlekin Matter filed by Apple, Inc.. (Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 49 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Further Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 48 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference NOT held on 9/18/14 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Court will reschedule a telephonic scheduling conference for Feb. 2015. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/2/2014)
September 16, 2014 47 Featured Case ORDER RE JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER AND STAY by Hon. William Alsup re 171 Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-03451-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-03451-WHA, 3:13-cv-04727-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Disregard, Posting Error. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 46 Disregard, Posting Error< (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2014 45 Joint MOTION for Clarification of Scheduling and Stay Orders re 41 Order, Order Staying Case filed by Apple, Inc.. (Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 9/15/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2014 44 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/14 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Telephonic Scheduling Conference re: Scheduling set for 9/18/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2014)
August 18, 2014 43 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. A conference call number and pass code has been arranged and circulated to all participants. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this Notice (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 12, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 11, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re 42 Case Management Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Jury Selection set for 2/9/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 42 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 10/31/2014. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Motions due by 12/4/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/11/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
May 30, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE AND DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/30/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 23, 2014 40 Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 22, 2014 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 5/22/2014) re (156 in 3:13-cv-03451-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc., (31 in 3:13-cv-04727-WHA) MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc. Motions taken under submission. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/22/2014)
May 8, 2014 38 REPLY (re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Rachael Palmisano, # 2 Declaration of Joshua Kienitz (Supplemental))(Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
May 1, 2014 37 DECLARATION of Taylor Kalin in Opposition to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byTaylor Kalin. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 36 DECLARATION of Lonnie C. Blanchard, III in Opposition to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byTaylor Kalin. (Related document(s) 31 ) (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 35 RESPONSE (re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byTaylor Kalin. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2014 34 EXHIBITS re 32 Declaration in Support, Joshua D. Kienitz Dec in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits B-E)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 33 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (re Exhibit A to Declaration of Steve Smith iso MSJ filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joshua D. Kienitz, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit CD Submitted Under Seal)(Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 32 Declaration of Joshua D. Kienitz in Support of 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A, Part 1 (Kalin Depo), # 2 Exhibit Exh A, Part 2 (Depo Exhs 1-7), # 3 Exhibit Exh A, Part 3 (Depo Exhs 8-11), # 4 Exhibit \Exh A, Part 4 (Depo Exh 12), # 5 Exhibit Exh A, Part 5 (Depo Exhs 12-13))(Related document(s) 31 ) (Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 5/1/2014. Replies due by 5/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Smith, # 2 Declaration Veilleux, Jason, # 3 Proposed Order)(Kienitz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
February 24, 2014 30 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/20/2014, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2014. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
February 20, 2014 29 Apple Summary Judgment Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2014 08:00 AM before Hon. William Alsup. Motion due by 4/10/2014. Responses due by 5/1/2014. Replies due by 5/8/2014. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/20/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 28 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/20/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/20/2014) re (108 in 3:13-cv-03451-WHA) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., (15 in 3:13-cv-04727-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (104 in 3:13-cv-03451-WHA) MOTION to Appoint Counsel (72 in 3:13-cv-03451-WHA) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Apple Inc., (68 in 3:13-cv-03451-WHA) Amended MOTION to Certify Class filed by Dean Pelle, Amanda Frlekin. Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2014 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 2/20/2014). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2014)
February 13, 2014 27 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 5, 2014 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Apple, Inc.. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
February 5, 2014 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 2/5/2014)
January 31, 2014 24 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
January 16, 2014 23 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel filed byApple, Inc.. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 14, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 14, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 2/20/2014 AT 8:00 AM by Hon. William Alsup [granting 21 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
January 13, 2014 RESET HEARING as to 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Consolidate Related Frlekin, Kilker and Kalin Actions. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 9, 2014 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE JANUARY 16, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 20, 2014 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 20 Supplemental Brief re 18 Order dated January 6, 2014 filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 19 Supplemental Brief re 18 Order filed byTaylor Kalin. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 6, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER RE CONSOLIDATION OF CASES AND REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/6/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 6, 2014 17 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/6/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 2, 2014 16 Statement of Non-Opposition re 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Motion to Consolidate Related Frlekin, Kilker and Kalin Actions filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 11, 2013 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-3451, 13-3775, 13-4727 Frlekin, Kilker and Kalin Actions filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 12/26/2013. Replies due by 1/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lara K. Strauss, # 2 Proposed Order)(Strauss, Lara) (Filed on 12/11/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2013 14 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Class, Collective and Representative Action byApple, Inc.. (Boyer, Todd) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
November 12, 2013 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against Apple, Inc.. Filed byTaylor Kalin. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 11/12/2013)
November 11, 2013 12 Error, DisregardAMENDED DOCUMENT by Taylor Kalin. Amendment to 1 Complaint First Amended Complaint. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 11/11/2013) Modified on 11/12/2013 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 11 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 10 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. Case is related to C13-3451 WHA. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/28/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
October 29, 2013 Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup. Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
October 28, 2013 8 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 15, 2013 7 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 15, 2013 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 10, 2013 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 4 Proposed Summons. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Taylor Kalin re 1 Complaint (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Taylor Kalin . (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
October 10, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8071102.). Filed byTaylor Kalin. (Dion-Kindem, Peter) (Filed on 10/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalin v. Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Kalin
Represented By: Lonnie Clifford Blanchard, III
Represented By: Peter Roald Dion-Kindem
Represented By: Jeffery Durham Holmes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]