Facebook Inc. v. Tarquini Featured Case

Facebook filed this lawsuit against Christopher Tarquini, who allegedly posted fake links to a supposed sex tape of Justin Bieber and Selena Gomez. The lawsuit alleges that Tarquini violated Facebook's use policies by using software scripts to gain unauthorized access to the service.

Defendant: Christopher Peter Tarquini
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05312
Filed: November 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2014 57 Order of Dismissal by Hon. Vince Chhabria and granting 56 Stipulation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 11, 2014 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gerlicher, Amelia) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
October 23, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 23, 2014 55 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 54 Stipulation Regarding Case Management Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 21, 2014 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gerlicher, Amelia) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 8, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 52 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 51 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and Vacate ADR Referral. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 3, 2014 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 49 Clerk's Notice,, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gerlicher, Amelia) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
September 15, 2014 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 49 Clerk's Notice,, (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 11, 2014 49 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Plaintiff shall provide the Court and all other parties with a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the hearing. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 2, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held 9/2/2014 with Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 25, 2014 48 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE NOTICE REGARDING PRO SE STATUS BY SEPTEMBER 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/20/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 20, 2014 47 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 46 Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff to October 2, 2014.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 38 Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Gerlicher, Amelia) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 11, 2014 45 NOTICE OF AMENDED DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/11/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 11, 2014 44 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, September 2, 2014 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
June 19, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 6/19/2014 with Daniel Bowling, ADR Program Staff Attorney. Defendant did not appear. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 13, 2014 43 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/19/2014 at 2:00 PM Pacific Time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
May 30, 2014 42 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Laura Ewbank (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 30, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled on Monday, June 2, 2014 at 12:00 PM Pacific Time is off calendar and will not be rescheduled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 30, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 6/19/2014 at 09:00 AM at JAMS, Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1500, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 28, 2014 41 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, June 2, 2014 at 12:00 PM Pacific Time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 39 Order (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 28, 2014 39 Notice of Reference and Order Re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/28/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 27, 2014 38 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/2/2014. Dispitive Motions to be heard by 1/16/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Selection set for 3/2/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2015 through 3/6/2015 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2014: # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service amended) (knm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/27/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2014: # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service amended) (knm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 36 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2014 before The Honorable Vince Chhabria (Date Filed: 5/27/2014), Case referred to mediation. Case Referred to random magistrate for all discovery. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (knm, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2014: # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service amended) (knm, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 35 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Gerlicher.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 22, 2014 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8638788.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gerlicher, Amelia) (Filed on 5/22/2014)
May 12, 2014 33 TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 32 MAILED TO DEFENDANT TARQUINI AND COUNSEL LISTED ON CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 32 CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 12, 2014 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 5/20/2014 at 10:00 AM Pacific Time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 1, 2014 31 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SEPARATE) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 30, 2014 30 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Alexander L. Brainerd as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 17, 2014 CASE REASSIGNED to the Honorable Vince Chhabria, United States District Judge. All parties must review the reassignment order posted at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf and comply with its requirements, including submitting a case management statement. This is a text only docket entry. The reassignment order associated with this notice may be viewed at http://cand.uscourts.gov/orders/vc-order.pdf Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2014. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/17/14. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
March 21, 2014 29 ADR Clerks Notice Vacating Appointment of Mediator Robert D. Links 28 . The ADR Unit will appoint another Mediator to this matter as soon as possible. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 18, 2014 28 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Robert D. Links as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 7, 2014 27 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/6/2014 before Judge Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 3/7/2014). Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #914-925.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2014)
March 3, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
February 27, 2014 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 22 Case Management Statement, 24 Declaration in Support, 23 MOTION to Appear by Telephone (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 24 Declaration of Laura T. Ewbank in Support of 23 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed byFacebook Inc.. (Related document(s) 23 ) (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 23 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference)(Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 27, 2014 22 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 20, 2014 21 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation to be completed within 120 days. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook Inc. filed by Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/20/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 13, 2014 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options, 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook Inc. (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Facebook Inc. filed by Facebook Inc.. (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 13, 2014 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
January 13, 2014 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. re 14 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
January 10, 2014 16 CLERKS NOTICE - LETTER FROM JUDGE CHEN RE: CONSENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 15 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 14 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
December 26, 2013 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc. (Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 6, 2013 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher Peter Tarquini. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 3, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 3, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Laura T. Ewbank (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8199144.) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ewbank, Laura) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 2, 2013 8 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 11 . *** ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/2/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified on 12/3/2013 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 26, 2013 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc... (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 15, 2013 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 4 Summons Issued as to Christopher Peter Tarquini. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract; Demand for Jury Trial against Christopher Peter Tarquini (Filing fee $ 400.00., Receipt Number 34611091393). Filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Facebook Inc. v. Tarquini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Peter Tarquini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Represented By: Laura Ewbank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]