Board of Trustees of Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Halopoff & Sons, Inc.

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Laborers Training&Retraining Trust Fd for Northern CA, Board of Trustees of Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fd for Northern CA and Board of Trustees of Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Halopoff & Sons, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv05329
Filed: November 15, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte (see order for details).(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
August 1, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a further case management conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. An updated case management statement is due by 8/26/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 28, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 Case Management Statement filed by Halopoff & Sons, Inc., John Halopoff, Jr., John Halopoff, Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Laporte on 8/27/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Board of Trustees of Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Halopoff & Sons, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Laborers Training&Retraining Trust Fd for Northern CA
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fd for Northern CA
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halopoff & Sons, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]