Brinskele v. The United States

Plaintiff: Edward A. Brinskele
Defendant: The United States
Case Number: 3:2013mc80094
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SERVICE OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2013.Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/27/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
September 23, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS GRANTING 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Writ of Garnishment. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
December 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 18 . ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 16 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
April 3, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting SHOW CAUSE Hearing for Garnishee Vir2us, Inc. Hearing set for 4/10/2014 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/03/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
September 29, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
August 12, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause re Service of Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinskele v. The United States
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A. Brinskele
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States
Represented By: Allie Yang-Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]