Bicek v. C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al

Defendant: Tracy Logistics, LLC and C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dennis Bicek
Miscellaneous: Natural Selection Foods LLC
Case Number: 3:2013mc80130
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CHANGE TIME 9 . Deadlines reset as to Third Party Motion to Quash 8 : Responses due by 7/12/2013; Replies due by 7/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/5/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/30/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
August 1, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S AND EARTHBOUND'S MOTIONS TO QUASH DEFENDANTS' SUBPOENAS 5 8 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bicek v. C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew More McNaught
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Bicek
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: Kitty Kit Yee Szeto
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Jill Jessica Parker
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Natural Selection Foods LLC
Represented By: Joshua O. Mates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.