Fuze Box v. Acision B.V.

Defendant: Acision B.V.
Plaintiff: Fuze Box
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv01376
Filed: March 25, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Initial Case Management Conference re 29 Notice of Settlement filed by Fuze Box. Status Report re Settlement due by 8/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/25/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
September 19, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/19/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
October 3, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Second Order to Submit Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/03/14. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fuze Box v. Acision B.V.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acision B.V.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuze Box
Represented By: Robert P. Andris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]