Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Industrial Commercial Concrete Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California and Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Industrial Commercial Concrete Construction, Inc. and Jeffrey J. Huston
 
Case Number: 3:2014cv02061
Filed: May 6, 2014
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (11 in 3:14-cv-02061-JSC) Case Management Statement (Request to continue CMC), filed by Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retrainin g Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/8/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
October 14, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (22 in 3:14-cv-02064-JSC) Request to Continue Case Management Conference, filed by Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Pension T rust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Board of Trustees of the Cement Masons Training Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/14/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
November 5, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying (19) Motion for Service by Publication in case 3:14-cv-02061-JSC; denying (19) Motion for Service by Publication in case 3:14-cv-02064-JSC (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO RESUBMIT DECLARATION OF RONALD L. RICHMAN WITH DEFENDANT HUSTON'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER REDACTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/5/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Industrial Commercial Concrete Construction, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Edward Douglas Winchester(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Ronald Lee Richman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Susan Jane Olson(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Commercial Concrete Construction, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J. Huston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]