Webpass Inc. v. Banth et al

Defendant: Squareplanet LLC, Rick Peters and Aftab Banth
Plaintiff: Webpass Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02291
Filed: May 16, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/24/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
October 21, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion for Order Authorizing Service of Summons and Complaint by Publication to December 16, 2014, Granting Extension of Time in Which to Complete Service, and Continuing Case Management Conference to February 24, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/21/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
December 18, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Aftab Banth's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/18/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Supplemental Briefing for Plaintiff's Motion for Order Authorizing Service of Summons and Complaint by Publication. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/18/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)
December 18, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Early Discovery; granting extension of time in which to complete discovery; continuing Case Management Conference to April 14, 2015, at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/18/2014. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webpass Inc. v. Banth et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Squareplanet LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aftab Banth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webpass Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Doroshow
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Kravitz(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]