Nicely v. International Game Technology

Plaintiff: Mark Nicely
Defendant: International Game Technology
Case Number: 3:2014cv03160
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FACTORS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/12/2014. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 29, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 15 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
September 10, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO 19 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/10/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014).
September 16, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION TO SEAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014).
March 5, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PER FRCP 41(A)(2). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicely v. International Game Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nicely
Represented By: Ryan L. Hicks(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Richard A. Hoyer(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Game Technology
Represented By: Aaron L. Agenbroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.