Forouhar v. Statoil, ASA

Plaintiff: Mitra N. Forouhar
Defendant: Statoil, ASA
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv03623
Filed: August 17, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/16/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
May 17, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadlines and Joint Status Report filed by Mitra N. Forouhar, Statoil, ASA. Signed by Judge AMSTRONG on 5/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
July 6, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Mitra N. Forouhar, Statoil, ASA. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
August 20, 2012 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 108 Status Report filed by Mitra N. Forouhar, Statoil, ASA. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
October 11, 2012 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
December 3, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2011 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
March 16, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 66 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Reply Declarations filed by Statoil, ASA.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 29, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 74 MOTION for Relief to Allow Filings filed by Mitra N. Forouhar. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
September 13, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating 74 Motion ; terminating 77 Motion ; denying 16 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
November 15, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 Stipulation filed by Mitra N. Forouhar, Statoil, ASA. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
January 18, 2012 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 96 Status Report, filed by Mitra N. Forouhar, Statoil, ASA. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
February 1, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2012 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Forouhar v. Statoil, ASA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitra N. Forouhar
Represented By: Paul Lindsey Hoffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statoil, ASA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]