In the Matter of the Referral of Gregory M. Haynes to the Standing Committee of the United States District Court

Miscellaneous: Standing Committee on Professional Conduct
 
Case Number: 4:2010cv04642
Filed: October 14, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISBARMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/22/2013. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
April 1, 2013 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 119 Letter filed by Gregory M. Haynes; ORDER STAYING ORDER OF DISBARMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/1/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 19, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING DISCIPLINARY MATTER TO THREE-JUDGE PANEL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
June 6, 2013 134 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. On or before 6/28/2013, Appellant and Respondent shall file simultaneous briefs, not to exceed five pages. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila, for the panel, on 6/6/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
August 21, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON APPLICABLE LOCAL RULE; ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE. Haynes' motions filed 4/5/2013 will be deemed his Opening Brief. The Standing Committee shall file its Responsive Brief on or before 9/10/2013. Haynes shall file his Reply Brief, if any, on or before 9/20/2013. The parties will thereafter be notified of a hearing date and time. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila for the Panel on 8/21/2013. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
February 11, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PETITION FOR REVIEW OF ORDER OF DISBARMENT. The grant of summary judgment of disbarment is AFFIRMED. Since this panel's involvement is now complete, the clerk of the court shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila for the Panel on 2/11/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PETITION FOR REVIEW OF ORDER OF DISBARMENT (reposted to include EJD signature). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila for the Panel on 2/11/2014. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
March 1, 2012 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Unsealing Case. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/1/12. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
July 6, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 66 Affidavit filed by Gregory M. Haynes; ORDER Denying Rule 56(d) Motion; ORDER Specifying Procedures and Issues for Determination. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/6/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
September 5, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/5/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
September 18, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/18/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 21, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/21/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In the Matter of the Referral of Gregory M. Haynes to the Standing Committee of the United States District Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Standing Committee on Professional Conduct
Represented By: E. Jeffrey Banchero
Represented By: Diane M. Doolittle
Represented By: David H. Fry
Represented By: Forrest Arthur Hainline
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]