Robinson Rancheria of Pomo Indians of California v. Quitiquit et al

Plaintiff: Robinson Rancheria of Pomo Indians of California
Defendant: Luwana Quitiquit, Robert Quitiquit, Karen Ramos, Inez Sands and Reuben Want
Case Number: 4:2011cv04348
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/19/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
February 16, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING scheduled 2/21/12 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/16/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
March 15, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/15/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson Rancheria of Pomo Indians of California v. Quitiquit et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Rancheria of Pomo Indians of California
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luwana Quitiquit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Quitiquit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ramos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inez Sands
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuben Want
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]