Diamond State Insurance Company v. Marin Mountain Bikes, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Diamond State Insurance Company
Defendant: Marin Mountain Bikes, Inc. and ATB Sales Limited
Case Number: 4:2011cv05193
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Admissions due by 12/30/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
January 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MARIN MOUNTAIN BIKES, INC.S 12 MOTION TO DISMISS, ABSTAIN OR STAY, AND VACATING HEARING. Responses due by 1/25/2012.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/18/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
April 13, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 19 REQUEST TO FILE SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL. 12 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OR TO ABSTAIN FROM EXERCISING JURISDICTION OR TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. Sur-reply due by 4/16/2012. Sur-Reply due by 4/19/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 23, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS 12 MOTION TO DISMISS, ABSTAIN OR STAY. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
September 10, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, DIAMONDS FIRST 32 MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE, GRANTING MARIN MOUNTAIN BIKES LEAVE TO FILE ITS PROPOSED AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, DEEMING REPLY BRIEF A MOTION TO STRIKE THE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, GRANTING DIAMONDS SECOND 36 MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISMISS, AND RESETTING DEADLINE TO HEAR CASE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 18, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 46 Stipulation Continue Trial Date and to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
December 21, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DIAMONDS 51 MOTION TO DISMISS MARINS SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS AND GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART, DIAMONDS 39 MOTION TO STRIKE MARINS AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 28, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Further Continue Pre-Trial Deadlines and Trial. Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Motion/ Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 02:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Selection/ Jury Trial (2 day) set for 8/19/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/28/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
January 14, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS 60 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 23, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 64 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
March 1, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 STIPULATION To Dismiss Action With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond State Insurance Company v. Marin Mountain Bikes, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diamond State Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer S. Cohn
Represented By: James Christian Nielsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Mountain Bikes, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATB Sales Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]