In re NCAA Student-Athlete Name Likeness Licensing Litigation

Respondent: Big Ten Network and Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Amicus: The SouthEastern Conference
Plaintiff: Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2011mc80300
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Cousins for Discovery purposes re 26 MOTION by Plaintiff In re NCAA Student-Athlete Name Likeness Licensing Litigation to compel 2 MOTION to compel Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/4/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 6, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: 2 26 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 1/6/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
February 7, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court TENTATIVE RULING on Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Parties. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/7/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
March 19, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS 65 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Responses due by 3/24/2012. Replies due by 3/27/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/19/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
April 9, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON ANTITRUST PLAINTIFFS' 65 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
August 7, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR SANCTIONS RE 21 Case No. 12-mc-80020 and 66 67 in Case No. 11-mc-80300. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 24, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR ANTITRUST 78 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NON-DISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE. Responses due by 8/29/2012. Replies due by 9/2/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re NCAA Student-Athlete Name Likeness Licensing Litigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Big Ten Network
Represented By: Debbie L. Berman
Represented By: Andrew Francis Merrick
Represented By: David R. Singer
Represented By: Matthew James Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Rosenman
Represented By: Michael Allen Olsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: The SouthEastern Conference
Represented By: Nathan Clifton Chase, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.
Represented By: Jon T. King
Represented By: Daniel O. Herrera
Represented By: Dominic J. Rizzi
Represented By: Jennifer Winter Sprengel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]