Twin Peaks Software Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Twin Peaks Software Inc.
Defendant: Red Hat, Inc. and Gluster, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00911
Filed: February 23, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 49 Stipulation (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 29, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 53 Granting Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition and Reply to Plaintiff Twin Peaks Software Inc.'s Motion to Retain Confidentiality of its Source Code and Continuance of Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/29/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
February 20, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte granting 56 Motion to Stay (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
July 24, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 65 of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 7/24/13. (jg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Twin Peaks Software Inc. v. Red Hat, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Peaks Software Inc.
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Hat, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gluster, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]