Meras Engineering Inc. et al v. Ch2O. Inc.

Plaintiff: Meras Engineering Inc. and Chad Walrod
Defendant: CH2O, Inc.
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv02738
Filed: May 29, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
February 12, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Chad Walrod, Meras Engineering Inc. Status Report due by 3/21/2013. Status Conference set for 3/28/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
March 20, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 DISMISSAL filed by Chad Walrod, Meras Engineering Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Meras Engineering Inc. et al v. Ch2O. Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meras Engineering Inc.
Represented By: Dawn M. Ross
Represented By: Kimberly Corcoran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Walrod
Represented By: Kimberly Corcoran
Represented By: Dawn M. Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH2O, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]