Corley v. Kinder Morgan, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richie W. Corley
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03209
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 13 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/26/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
September 19, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (10/18/2012 AT 8:00 AM) by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 19 Stipulation].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
October 18, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING KINDER MORGAN'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [denying 16 Motion to Transfer Case]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 19, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup [denying 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
February 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corley v. Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richie W. Corley
Represented By: Kenneth N. Frucht
Represented By: Frederick J. Geonetta
Represented By: Joy Huang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]