United States of America v. $30,064.94 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX08318 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $30,064.94 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX08318, $8,298.00 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX21933 and $854.53 in Funds Seized From Acct XXXXX60403
Claimant: Coast Exports, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2012cv03839
Filed: July 23, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 19 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 21 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
September 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 23 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $30,064.94 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX08318 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Arvon Jacque Perteet
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $30,064.94 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX08318
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,298.00 in Funds Seized From Acct #XXXXX21933
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $854.53 in Funds Seized From Acct XXXXX60403
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Coast Exports, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard Lam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]