Hansen v. City of San Francisco et al

Defendant: Gregory P. Suhr, George Gascon and City of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Gared Hansen
Case Number: 4:2012cv04210
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
December 4, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE. THE COURT INITIATES ALL CONFERENCE CALLS. PLEASE CONTACT THE CLERK TO PROVIDE PHONE NUMBER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/3/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
December 10, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 12/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
February 6, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING; DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of San Francisco, Denying at Moot 47 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Gared Hansen. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
March 26, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by City of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 31, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #56. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. City of San Francisco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory P. Suhr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Gascon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Francisco
Represented By: Lisa Beth Berkowitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gared Hansen
Represented By: Michael Andrew McGill
Represented By: Christopher Gaspard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]