Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Gary L. Lewis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2012cv04258
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 6 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 8 Motion to Transfer Case (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
October 5, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 14 Motion for Recusal. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore striking 16 Motion to Dismiss (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
February 5, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 27 Motion to Disqualify Judge (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2013.. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on February 27, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 18, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on March 19, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L. Lewis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cynthia B. De Nardi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]